Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/16/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/06/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/10/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/11/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/11/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/11/2014