Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/15/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 11/15/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/21/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/04/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/16/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/16/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/16/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/09/2014