Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/13/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/13/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/21/2014