Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/18/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/28/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/01/2014