Refine your search

Date Major Actions
03/21/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-89.
03/21/2014 Signed by President.
03/18/2014 Presented to President.
03/13/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 3/13/2014, having received 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 22. Record Vote Number: 78.
03/04/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 306 - 91 (Roll no. 91).(text: CR H2128-2132)
10/29/2013 Introduced in House