Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/29/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/10/2014