Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/11/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/25/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014