Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/11/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/10/2014