Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/18/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/03/2013