Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/15/2013