Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/10/2014