Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/28/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 10/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/30/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 10/30/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/18/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/08/2014