Text: H.R.3350 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/18/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 3350 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                H. R. 3350


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           November 18, 2013

                                Received

                           December 20, 2013

 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, 
                              and Pensions

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
  To authorize health insurance issuers to continue to offer for sale 
  current individual health insurance coverage in satisfaction of the 
minimum essential health insurance coverage requirement, and for other 
                               purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Keep Your Health Plan Act of 2013''.

SEC. 2. IF YOU LIKE YOUR HEALTH CARE PLAN, YOU CAN KEEP IT.

    (a) In General.--Notwithstanding any provision of the Patient 
Protection and Affordable Care Act (including any amendment made by 
such Act or by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 
2010), a health insurance issuer that has in effect health insurance 
coverage in the individual market as of January 1, 2013, may continue 
after such date to offer such coverage for sale during 2014 in such 
market outside of an Exchange established under section 1311 or 1321 of 
such Act (42 U.S.C. 18031, 18041).
    (b) Treatment as Grandfathered Health Plan in Satisfaction of 
Minimum Essential Coverage.--Health insurance coverage described in 
subsection (a) shall be treated as a grandfathered health plan 


              

for purposes of the amendment made by section 1501(b) of the Patient 
Protection and Affordable Care Act.

            Passed the House of Representatives November 15, 2013.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.