Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/28/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/29/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/30/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/30/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/30/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/13/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/14/2013