Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/07/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/14/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/05/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/02/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/07/2014