Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/03/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/29/2014