Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/14/2013