Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/30/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/10/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/06/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/18/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/21/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/21/2014