Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/28/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 10/28/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/30/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/30/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 10/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/11/2014