Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/07/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/07/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/09/2013