Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/01/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/01/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/01/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/01/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/02/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/02/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/02/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/02/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/02/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/02/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/03/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/03/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/03/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/03/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/03/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/03/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/03/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/03/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 10/03/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/03/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/03/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/03/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 10/03/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/04/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/04/2013