Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/25/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/03/2014