Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/05/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/13/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/28/2013