Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/18/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/18/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/18/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/18/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/25/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/25/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/04/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/08/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/08/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/18/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/26/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/03/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/18/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/19/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/11/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/04/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/21/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/10/2014