Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/26/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/28/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 10/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2014