Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/25/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/30/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/10/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 12/04/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/15/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/05/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/10/2014