Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/03/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/28/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/19/2013