Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/25/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/28/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/30/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/30/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/01/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/01/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/01/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/01/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/01/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/02/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/02/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/08/2013