Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/21/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/05/2014