Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/03/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/15/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/04/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2014