Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/08/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/08/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/08/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/16/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 11/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/14/2014