Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/08/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/10/2014