Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/08/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/16/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/14/2014