Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/18/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/20/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/20/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/23/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/23/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/27/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/27/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/14/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/28/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/22/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/04/2014