Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/27/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/27/2014