Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/27/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/03/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/21/2014