Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/29/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2014