Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/10/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/13/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/16/2013