Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/29/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/29/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/06/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/06/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/04/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/04/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/04/2014