Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/16/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/16/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 09/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/19/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/20/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/03/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/15/2013