Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 01/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/25/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/08/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/14/2014