Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/25/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/24/2014