Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/01/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/08/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/07/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/17/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/25/2013