Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/19/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/22/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/30/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/05/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/19/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/10/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/17/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 01/21/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/21/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/21/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/06/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/11/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/05/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/05/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/06/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/27/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/27/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/27/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/10/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/10/2014