Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 10/28/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/22/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/22/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/05/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/05/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/11/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/16/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/16/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/16/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/04/2014