Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/26/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/26/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/28/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/01/2013