Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/09/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 10/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2013