Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/06/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/01/2014