Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/23/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 02/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/06/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/27/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/27/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/27/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/03/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/28/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/01/2014