Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/23/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 02/04/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/04/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/04/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/26/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/25/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2013